numbers aptitude questions

131.

A number when divided successively by 4 and 5 leaves remainders 1 and 4 respectively. When it is successively divided by 5 and 4, then the respective remainders will be
A.     1, 2    B.     2, 3
C.     3, 2    D.     4, 1
Answer & Explanation

Answer: Option B

Explanation:

4 | x            y = (5 x 1 + 4) = 9
——–
5 | y -1         x = (4 x y + 1) = (4 x 9 + 1) = 37
——–
| 1 -4

Now, 37 when divided successively by 5 and 4, we get

5 | 37
———
4 | 7 – 2
———
| 1 – 3

Respective remainders are 2 and 3.

132.

8796 x 223 + 8796 x 77 = ?
A.     2736900    B.     2638800
C.     2658560    D.     2716740
E.     None of these
Answer & Explanation

Answer: Option B

Explanation:

8796 x 223 + 8796 x 77     = 8796 x (223 + 77)   [Ref: By Distributive Law ]
= (8796 x 300)
= 2638800

133.

8988 ÷ 8 ÷ 4 = ?
A.     4494    B.     561.75
C.     2247    D.     280.875
E.     None of these
Answer & Explanation

Answer: Option D

Explanation:

Given Exp. = 8988 x     1     x     1     =     2247     = 280.875
8     4     8

134.

287 x 287 + 269 x 269 – 2 x 287 x 269 = ?
A.     534    B.     446
C.     354    D.     324
E.     None of these
Answer & Explanation

Answer: Option D

Explanation:

Given Exp.     = a2 + b2 – 2ab, where a = 287 and b = 269
= (a – b)2 = (287 – 269)2
= (182)
= 324

135.

3 + 33 + 333 + 3.33 = ?
A.     362.3    B.     372.33
C.     702.33    D.     702
E.     None of these
Answer & Explanation

Answer: Option B

Explanation:

3
+  33
+ 333
+   3.33
——
372.33
——

136.

Which one of the following can’t be the square of natural number ?
A.     30976    B.     75625
C.     28561    D.     143642
E.     None of these
Answer & Explanation

Answer: Option D

Explanation:

The square of a natural number nerver ends in 2.

143642 is not the square of natural number.

137.

(1000)9 ÷ 1024 = ?
A.     10000    B.     1000
C.     100    D.     10
E.     None of these
Answer & Explanation

Answer: Option B

Explanation:

Given Exp. =     (1000)9     =     (103)9     =     (10)27     = 10(27-24) = 103 = 1000
1024     1024     1024

138.

{(476 + 424)2 – 4 x 476 x 424} = ?
A.     2906    B.     3116
C.     2704    D.     2904
E.     None of these
Answer & Explanation

Answer: Option C

Explanation:

Given Exp.     = [(a + b)2 – 4ab], where a = 476 and b = 424
= [(476 + 424)2 – 4 x 476 x 424]
= [(900)2 – 807296]
= 810000 – 807296
= 2704.

 

Leave a Reply0